Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/14/1991
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 03/14/1991
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/14/1991
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/14/1991
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 03/14/1991
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/14/1991
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 03/14/1991
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/14/1991
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/14/1991
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 03/14/1991
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 03/21/1991
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 03/21/1991
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 03/22/1991
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/09/1991
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/21/1991
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/03/1991
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/03/1991
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/05/1991
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/11/1991
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/18/1991
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/20/1991
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 06/20/1991
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/25/1991
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/26/1991
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/08/1991
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 07/08/1991
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 07/10/1991
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/17/1991
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/19/1991
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/19/1991
Sen. Garn, E. J. (Jake) [R-UT] 07/19/1991
Sen. Symms, Steven D. [R-ID] 07/19/1991
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/19/1991
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/23/1991
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/23/1991
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/24/1991
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/24/1991
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/26/1991
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 07/26/1991
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 07/26/1991
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 07/26/1991
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 07/26/1991
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/26/1991
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 07/26/1991
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 07/26/1991
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/26/1991
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/26/1991
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/26/1991
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/30/1991
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/30/1991
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 08/01/1991
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 08/02/1991
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/10/1991