Text: S.Res.94 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate

 
 
SRES 94 IS
102d CONGRESS
1st Session
S. RES. 94
Commemorating the two-year anniversary of the Soviet crackdown in Tbilisi,
Georgia, on April 9, 1989, and urging the Soviet Union to recognize the will
of the Georgian people and the legitimacy of the March 31, 1991, referendum.
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
April 9, 1991
Mr. HELMS submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the
Committee on Foreign Relations
RESOLUTION
Commemorating the two-year anniversary of the Soviet crackdown in Tbilisi,
Georgia, on April 9, 1989, and urging the Soviet Union to recognize the will
of the Georgian people and the legitimacy of the March 31, 1991, referendum.
Whereas, on April 9, 1989, Soviet Red Army soldiers brutally attacked unarmed
and peaceful demonstrators in Lenin Square (now Liberty Square) in Tbilisi,
Georgia, using clubs, sharpened shovels, and poison gas, and killing 20
innocent demonstrators and injuring hundreds more;
Whereas, despite efforts made to conceal the acts of Soviet brutality,
world humanitarian leaders such as Mother Teresa of Calcutta and a team of
West German doctors specializing in the treatment of toxic gas victims came
to Tbilisi to help the devastated survivors;
Whereas acts of brutality on that April 9th led to a realignment of the
balance of political power within the Georgian Republic and resulted in a
formal end to Communist rule with the elections of October 28, 1990;
Whereas Georgia refused to participate in a referendum held by the Central
Soviet Government on March 17, 1991, and instead held its own referendum on
March 31, 1991, in which 98.9 percent of the voters supported restoration of
national independence to Georgia, thus reaffirming the ancient, distinctive,
and separate character of their national identity which reaches back to
before the birth of Christ; and
Whereas, today, April 9, 1991, is the two-year anniversary of the crackdown
in Tbilisi: Now, therefore, be it
  Resolved, That the Senate hereby--
  (1) reaffirms its support for the demands of the people of Georgia in
  their peaceful efforts and demonstrations to regain national independence
  for their nation and territory;
  (2) reaffirms its support for the demands of the people of Georgia for
  self-determination, in the spirit of the Final Act of the Helsinki Conference
  on Security and Cooperation in Europe, of which the Soviet Union is a party;
  (3) reaffirms its support for the God-given human rights of the people
  of Georgia;
  (4) commemorates the sacrifice of the Georgians who lost their lives in
  Tbilisi on April 9, 1989, as they were peacefully demonstrating for freedom
  and independence; and
  (5) and urges the Government of the Soviet Union to recognize the will of
  the Georgian people and the legitimacy of the March 31, 1991, referendum.