Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 03/03/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 03/03/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 03/03/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/03/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 03/09/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/09/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/09/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/11/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/11/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/11/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/23/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/23/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/23/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/30/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/30/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/30/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/30/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/30/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/30/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/30/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 04/01/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/01/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/01/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/01/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/21/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/28/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/13/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/18/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/19/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/26/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/26/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/26/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 06/10/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 06/18/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/21/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/23/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/30/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/03/1993
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 11/10/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/23/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 07/13/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/02/1994