Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/08/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/08/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/08/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/29/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 04/29/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/10/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/10/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/10/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/10/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/10/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/16/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/16/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/16/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/16/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/16/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/16/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/16/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/16/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/22/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/22/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/22/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/22/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 06/22/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/22/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/22/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 06/22/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/22/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/22/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/22/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/22/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/22/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/29/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/29/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/29/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/29/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/29/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/29/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/29/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/29/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 06/29/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/29/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/13/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/13/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/13/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/13/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 07/13/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/27/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/27/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/27/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 08/06/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 09/30/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 09/30/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/20/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/08/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 02/22/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 03/15/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/15/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 04/21/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/12/1994