Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/02/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/02/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/02/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/18/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/18/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/25/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/25/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/02/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/02/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 04/02/1993

Show cosponsors who withdrew