Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/02/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 03/09/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 03/29/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/30/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/05/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/22/1993