Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/23/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/23/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/11/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/11/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 03/11/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/11/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/11/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/11/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/11/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 04/22/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/22/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/22/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/22/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 04/22/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/22/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/06/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/06/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/16/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/16/1994