Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/09/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/09/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/09/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/09/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/09/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/11/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/11/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/11/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/17/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/17/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/17/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 03/24/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/24/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/24/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/25/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 03/25/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/01/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/01/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 04/01/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/01/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 04/01/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/01/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/01/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/20/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/20/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/20/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/20/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/20/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/20/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/20/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 04/20/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 04/20/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/21/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/21/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/21/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/21/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/21/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/21/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 04/21/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 04/21/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/27/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/27/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/27/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/27/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 04/27/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/27/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/27/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/28/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/28/1993
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 04/28/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 04/28/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/05/1993
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 05/11/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 05/11/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/11/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/19/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/19/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/19/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/19/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/19/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/25/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/25/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/25/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/25/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/09/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 06/09/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/09/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/10/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/10/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/18/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/23/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/23/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/23/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/23/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/29/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/29/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/29/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/29/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/30/1993
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/30/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/30/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/30/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/30/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/30/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 06/30/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/30/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/01/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/01/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/01/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/01/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/13/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/13/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/13/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 07/13/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/13/1993
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 07/20/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 07/20/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/27/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 08/04/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 08/04/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 09/13/1993