Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/23/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/24/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/24/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/24/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/24/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/24/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/24/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/24/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/24/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 04/20/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/15/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 10/12/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/14/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 11/08/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/17/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 11/17/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 11/19/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/19/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/19/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 11/19/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/25/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/25/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/25/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/25/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 01/25/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/25/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 01/26/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/26/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 02/01/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/01/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 02/01/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/01/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/02/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/02/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/03/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/03/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/08/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/08/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/08/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 02/08/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 02/09/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/23/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/23/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/23/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/08/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/12/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/08/1994