Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 02/24/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 02/24/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/02/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/02/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/03/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/03/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/24/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/02/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/19/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/19/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/05/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/20/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/20/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/15/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/22/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/23/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 06/28/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/13/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/23/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/21/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 10/06/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/06/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/07/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 02/10/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 08/05/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/23/1994