Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 02/24/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/24/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/24/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/02/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/02/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 03/02/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/03/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/03/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/31/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/02/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/02/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/19/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 04/19/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/19/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/22/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/22/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/22/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/22/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/19/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/19/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/20/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/25/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/25/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/25/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/08/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/08/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/10/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/15/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/23/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/28/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/13/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/23/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/02/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 08/02/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/02/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/03/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 08/03/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 09/21/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/27/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/30/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/06/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 10/06/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/06/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 11/03/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 11/09/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/10/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 11/19/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 02/09/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 02/10/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/22/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/28/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/11/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/16/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/02/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 05/09/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 06/17/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 06/22/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/23/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/29/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/29/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/12/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 07/12/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 07/12/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/28/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 07/28/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/28/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/29/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 08/04/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/08/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/16/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/19/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 09/20/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 10/07/1994