Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/27/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 01/27/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 01/27/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/27/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/27/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/03/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/03/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 02/03/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/03/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/16/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/16/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/16/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/16/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/16/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 02/16/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/16/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/16/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/16/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/16/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/16/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/16/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 02/17/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/17/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 02/17/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 02/17/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/17/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/17/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 02/17/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/17/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/02/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/02/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/02/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/02/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 03/02/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/02/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/09/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/09/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/16/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/16/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/16/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/16/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/16/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/29/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/29/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/25/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/28/1993