Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 01/05/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/25/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 03/25/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/25/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 03/25/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/25/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/25/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/25/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/25/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 03/25/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/25/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/25/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/25/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 03/25/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 03/25/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 03/25/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/25/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/25/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/25/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/25/1993
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/25/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/25/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/25/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/25/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/29/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/29/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/19/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/03/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/03/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 03/24/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 03/24/1994
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/24/1994