There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Merchant Seamen Reemployment Rights Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Merchant Marine Act, 1936 to establish reemployment rights for certain merchant seamen.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
03/16/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 0 (Roll no. 72).
02/24/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
05/24/1994HouseText of Measure Incorporated Into H.R.4003.
11/09/1993HouseText of Measure Incorporated Into H.R.3400.
03/18/1993SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
03/16/1993-2:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/16/1993-2:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 0 (Roll no. 72).
03/16/1993-2:05pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1256-1257)
03/16/1993-1:27pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/16/1993-1:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
03/16/1993-1:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1249-1252)
03/16/1993-1:19pmHouseMr. Studds moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/04/1993HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine
03/04/1993HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine
03/04/1993HouseReferred to the Subcommittee On Merchant Marine.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
02/24/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
02/24/1993HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E447)
02/24/1993HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries02/24/1993 Referred to
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine03/04/1993 Referred to
03/04/1993 Markup by
03/04/1993 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/18/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1109.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1109. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/24/1993)

Merchant Seamen Reemployment Rights Act of 1993 - Amends the Merchant Marine Act, 1936 to entitle a merchant mariner who serves during a war, armed conflict, national emergency, or mobilization need to the same reemployment rights as are guaranteed to a member of a Reserve component of the armed forces who is ordered to active duty.