Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/29/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/29/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/29/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/29/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/29/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/29/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/01/1994