Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 02/24/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/29/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/29/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/29/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/29/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/29/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/29/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/29/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/29/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/29/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/31/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/01/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 04/19/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/21/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/28/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 04/28/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/20/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 05/20/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/15/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/20/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 08/05/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/13/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/02/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/09/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/17/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/17/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 11/22/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/22/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/26/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/28/1994