There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Old Faithful Protection Act of 1993

Short Titles as Introduced

Old Faithful Protection Act of 1993

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate for portions of this bill
  • Lost Creek Land Exchange Act of 1994
  • Old Faithful Protection Act of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Geothermal Steam Act of 1970 (30 U.S.C. 1001-1027), and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
11/30/1994By Senator Johnston from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 103-431. Minority views filed.
09/28/1994Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
11/15/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
11/15/1993Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-364.
02/24/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
11/30/1994SenateBy Senator Johnston from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 103-431. Minority views filed.
09/28/1994SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 675.
09/28/1994SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report.
09/21/1994SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/16/1994SenateSubcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests
03/16/1994SenateSubcommittee on Mineral Resources Development. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Mineral Resources Development and Production
03/01/1994SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
11/17/1993SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
11/16/1993SenateReceived in the Senate.
11/15/1993-4:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/15/1993-4:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
11/15/1993-4:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
11/15/1993-4:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9623-9627)
11/15/1993-4:22pmHouseMr. Lehman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/15/1993HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 198.
11/15/1993HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-364.
11/10/1993HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/10/1993HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/10/1993HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
06/10/1993HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
04/22/1993HouseJoint Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources and by the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
03/18/1993HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/24/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/24/1993HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E440)
02/24/1993HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/24/1993 Referred to
11/10/1993 Markup by
11/15/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-364
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources03/18/1993 Referred to
04/22/1993 Hearings by
06/10/1993 Markup by
06/10/1993 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/17/1993 Referred to
09/21/1994 Markup by
09/28/1994 Reported by S.Rept 103-431
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Mineral Resources Development and Production03/16/1994 Hearings by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests03/16/1994 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1137.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1137. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (09/28/1994)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: Old Faithful Protection Act

Title II: Lost Creek Land Exchange

Title I: Old Faithful Protection Act - Old Faithful Protection Act of 1994 - Declares that any use, production, exploration, or development of any new or existing geothermal well within the boundary of the Yellowstone Protection Area risks adverse effects upon the thermal features of Yellowstone National Park.

Prohibits the Secretary of the Interior from issuing any geothermal lease for lands within the boundary of the Area.

Places a moratorium upon the use, production, development or exploration of any wells within the Area.

Directs the Secretary to take the steps necessary to protect the Park's thermal systems and features.

Directs the National Park Service to research, inventory, and report to the Congress at least every five years on the current and potential effects of hydrothermal or geothermal development upon protected systems and features. Mandates the exclusive use of nonintrusive methodologies.

Prescribes guidelines under which the State of Montana, is encouraged to implement federally approved State management programs for regulated resources outside Yellowstone National Park. Requires a permit issued by a State agency implementing a federally approved State program before undertaking activities related to regulated resources on non-Federal lands within the Area. Prescribes approval guidelines for management programs implemented by the State of Montana.

Declares that the water rights compact entered into by the United States and the State of Montana on January 31, 1994, shall be considered an approved State program for regulation of groundwater resources within Yellowstone Protection Area.

Provides for judicial review of administrative procedures relating to this Act.

Authorizes appropriations.

Prescribes guidelines for the Secretary of Agriculture to acquire by exchange certain lands and interests in lands owned by the Church Universal and Triumphant located in the Yellowstone Controlled Groundwater Area and Corwin Springs Known Geothermal Resource Area of the Gallatin National Forest.

Title II: Lost Creek Land Exhange - Lost Creek Land Exchange Act of 1994 - Prescribes guidelines for the Secretary of Agriculture to acquire by exchange certain lands and interests in lands owned by the Brand S Corporation (the Corporation) located in the Lost Creek area of the Deerlodge National Forest and within the Gallatin National Forest.