Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/18/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 03/18/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 03/18/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/18/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 03/18/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/18/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/18/1993
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/18/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/18/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/18/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/18/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/18/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 03/18/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 03/18/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/30/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/30/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/30/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/30/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/20/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/20/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 04/20/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/20/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/20/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/04/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/04/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/19/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/19/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/19/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/15/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/01/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/13/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/13/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/13/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/27/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 10/27/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 04/12/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/08/1994