There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Elementary and Secondary School Library Media Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for elementary and secondary school library media resources, technology enhancement, training and improvement.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/25/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/16/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
02/25/1993Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/25/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/25/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/25/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/02/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/02/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 03/02/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/02/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/02/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/11/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/11/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/11/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/31/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/31/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/31/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/21/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/21/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/21/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/28/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/28/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/19/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/19/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/19/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 05/19/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/19/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 05/20/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/20/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/20/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/20/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/18/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/18/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/18/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/15/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/15/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/15/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/08/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/08/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 09/08/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 09/08/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/21/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/21/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/21/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/06/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/06/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 10/06/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 11/10/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/10/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 11/10/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/22/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 01/25/1994
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 01/25/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/25/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/02/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/10/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/21/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/21/1994
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 04/21/1993 11/22/1993 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor02/25/1993 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education03/16/1993 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1151. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/25/1993)

Elementary and Secondary School Library Media Act - Amends the Department of Education Organization Act to establish a Division of Elementary and Secondary School Library Media Services within the Office of Educational Research and Improvement.

Requires the Director of the Division to award grants to States for acquisition of school library media resources for public elementary and secondary schools. Sets forth requirements for allocation to States, State plans, and State distribution of allocation to local educational agencies. Authorizes appropriations.

Requires the Director to award grants for projects that: (1) encourage collaboration between public elementary and secondary library media specialists and teachers to develop instructional units that enable students to use a variety of information resources; and (2) expand students' information-gathering abilities and certain cognitive skills. Authorizes appropriations.

Requires the Director to award grants to encourage collaborative elementary and secondary school library media specialist and teacher programs to: (1) expand use of computers and computer networks in the curriculum; and (2) enable elementary and secondary school library media centers to access information from computerized databases. Authorizes the Director to enter into cooperative agreements with the National Science Foundation and other appropriate nonprofit agencies and organizations in carrying out this grants program. Authorizes appropriations.

Requires that funds under this Act supplement and not supplant other Federal, State, or local funds.