Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-3]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/04/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 03/04/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/16/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/16/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 03/17/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/17/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/18/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/24/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/30/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 03/30/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/30/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/30/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/30/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 04/21/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/04/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/10/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/10/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/25/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/26/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/26/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/08/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/09/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/09/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/15/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 07/13/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/13/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 07/26/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 08/02/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/02/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/02/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/03/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/05/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/05/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 08/05/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/05/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/05/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/13/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/27/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 09/27/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/27/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 09/30/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/30/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/06/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 10/12/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/27/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 11/02/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/25/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/25/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/22/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/22/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 02/22/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/22/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/11/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/11/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/16/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/24/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/14/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/14/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/14/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 05/17/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/14/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/14/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 06/14/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/16/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/27/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 07/19/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/28/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/04/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 08/17/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/04/1994