Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/02/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/02/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/02/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/02/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/07/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 04/20/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/26/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/03/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/18/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/22/1993