Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/02/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/07/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 04/07/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 04/20/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/20/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/21/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/21/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/03/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/27/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/28/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/10/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/10/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 11/15/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/18/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/18/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/18/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/22/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/22/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 11/23/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/25/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/25/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/02/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 02/02/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/02/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/02/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/02/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/02/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/10/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/10/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/10/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/10/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/10/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/12/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/28/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 07/28/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/28/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/02/1994