Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 03/02/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/01/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/01/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/01/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/01/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 04/01/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 04/01/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/01/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/01/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/01/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 04/01/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/01/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/22/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/22/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/22/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/22/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 04/22/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 04/22/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 05/06/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/06/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/13/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 05/19/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/19/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/09/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/09/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/22/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 06/22/1993
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 06/22/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/22/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/22/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/22/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/28/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/28/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 07/13/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 07/13/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/13/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 07/13/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/20/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/20/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/20/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/20/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/20/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/23/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/23/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 07/23/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/29/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 08/02/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 08/04/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 08/04/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/04/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/08/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/08/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/29/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/29/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/29/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/29/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 09/29/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/29/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/29/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/29/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 10/14/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/14/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/27/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 10/27/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 11/04/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 11/04/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 11/04/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 11/04/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 11/16/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/26/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 01/26/1994
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 01/26/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/26/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/26/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/26/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/26/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/09/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/10/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 02/24/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/24/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/08/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/08/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/29/1994