There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Capital Budgeting Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve budgetary information by requiring that the unified budget presented by the President contain an operating budget and a capital budget, distinguish between general funds, trust funds, and enterprise funds, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/02/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
06/16/1993Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Economic Development
05/26/1993Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Economic Development
03/15/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
03/10/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
Action By: Committee on Government Operations
03/02/1993Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/1993Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/1993Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E481)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/02/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/22/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/22/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/22/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/25/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/21/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/28/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 09/28/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 10/06/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 11/03/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/18/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/16/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/16/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/16/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 06/27/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/27/1994

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Operations03/02/1993 Referred to
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security03/10/1993 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation03/02/1993 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Economic Development03/15/1993 Referred to
06/16/1993 Hearings by
House Rules03/02/1993 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1182. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/02/1993)

Capital Budgeting Act of 1993 - Amends Federal law to require that the budget the President submits to the Congress be a unified budget comprising an operating budget and a capital budget, each presented separately for unified, general, trust, and enterprise funds. Restricts the capital budget to the major activities and programs supporting the acquisition, construction, alteration, and rehabilitation of capital assets and includes all other items in the operating budget. Requires the President to present certain additional information, including the capital investments by State and local governments not financed by the Federal Government.

Requires the House Committee on the Budget to submit legislation to establish additional deficit targets under the Balanced Budget and Emergency Deficit Control Act of 1985 (Gramm-Rudman-Hollings Act) beginning in FY 1995 which would require the eventual elimination of deficits in the operating account.

Requires the House Committee on Government Operations to report legislation directing the Comptroller General to evaluate the value and usefulness: (1) of capital investments in the capital account on an annual basis; and (2) of proposed capital investments submitted to the House after enactment of this Act.

Requires the House Committee on Rules to report legislation establishing rules to facilitate the enforcement of amendments made by this Act.

Amends the Public Works and Economic Development Act of 1965 to require reports to specified congressional committees on the actual, estimated, and proposed appropriations, receipts, and expenditures for capital and operating activities associated with certain transportation, water, and public buildings projects.