Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/02/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 03/02/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/22/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/22/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/22/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/25/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/21/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/28/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 09/28/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 10/06/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 11/03/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/18/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/16/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/16/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 06/16/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 06/27/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/27/1994