Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 03/03/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/03/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/09/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/09/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/23/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/23/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/25/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/19/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/19/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/22/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/13/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/23/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/02/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/08/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/08/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/21/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/21/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 10/06/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/06/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 10/22/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/07/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 02/10/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/22/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/28/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/16/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/23/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 05/09/1994