Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/03/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/03/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1]* 03/03/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 03/18/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/18/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/18/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/18/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/18/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/02/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/02/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 04/02/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 04/02/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/02/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/02/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/28/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/28/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/28/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 04/28/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 04/28/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/14/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/14/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/14/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/15/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/22/1993