Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/03/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 03/03/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 03/03/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/18/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/18/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/18/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/24/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/24/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/30/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/20/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/20/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/21/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/21/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/27/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/27/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 05/06/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/19/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/24/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/09/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/09/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/10/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 06/15/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/15/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/16/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/16/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 06/16/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/22/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/24/1993
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/28/1993
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/15/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/03/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/09/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 11/22/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/22/1993

Show cosponsors who withdrew