Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 04/22/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/22/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/22/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/22/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 04/22/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/22/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/22/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/22/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/22/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/24/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/08/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/23/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/23/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/19/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 08/03/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/03/1994