Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/05/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 01/25/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/25/1993
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-3] 01/25/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/25/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 01/25/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 01/25/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 01/25/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 01/25/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/25/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 01/25/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 01/25/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/25/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/25/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 01/25/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 01/25/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/25/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/25/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/25/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 01/25/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/03/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/03/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/03/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 02/03/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/03/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/03/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 02/03/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/23/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 02/23/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/23/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/23/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/23/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 03/03/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/21/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 04/21/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/21/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/21/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/04/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/04/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/04/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/04/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/04/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/04/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/04/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/12/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/12/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/12/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/19/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/19/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 06/15/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/15/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/15/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/15/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/15/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/15/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/14/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/14/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/22/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/22/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/08/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/04/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 10/04/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/04/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 11/16/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/11/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/11/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/01/1994
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 03/01/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/17/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/17/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/17/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/13/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/13/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/04/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/04/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/04/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/04/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 05/04/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/04/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 05/04/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/04/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 05/04/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/05/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/05/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/11/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/11/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 05/11/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/11/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/23/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/23/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/23/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/23/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/23/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/23/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/23/1994
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/23/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/23/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/23/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/26/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/26/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/26/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/09/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/09/1994
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 06/09/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/09/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/09/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 06/09/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/15/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/28/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/28/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/28/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/28/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 06/29/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/22/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/22/1994
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/22/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 07/22/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/22/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/22/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 09/22/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 09/22/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 09/22/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 09/22/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/22/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/07/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/07/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew