There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Child Protection Act of 1993

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Child Protection Act of 1993

Short Titles as Introduced

National Child Protection Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish procedures for national criminal background checks for child care providers.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/1993Became Public Law No: 103-209.
12/20/1993Signed by President.
12/08/1993Presented to President.
11/20/1993Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S16865-16866)
11/20/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
11/20/1993Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 103-393.
03/04/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/1993Became Public Law No: 103-209.
12/20/1993Signed by President.
12/08/1993HousePresented to President.
11/22/1993SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/20/1993SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S16865-16866)
11/20/1993-12:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/20/1993-12:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
11/20/1993-11:50amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
11/20/1993-11:50amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10323-10326)
11/20/1993-11:50amHouseMr. Edwards (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/20/1993HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 218.
11/20/1993HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 103-393.
11/17/1993HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/17/1993HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/16/1993HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights
11/16/1993HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights
07/16/1993HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights
03/09/1993HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/04/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
03/04/1993HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1018)
03/04/1993HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 03/04/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/04/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 03/04/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/04/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/04/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 03/04/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/29/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/29/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/29/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/29/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/29/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/31/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/31/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/31/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/31/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/22/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/22/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 04/22/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/22/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 04/22/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/22/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/29/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/29/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/15/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/15/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/15/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/15/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 07/15/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/21/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/21/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/21/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/21/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/21/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 11/17/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/17/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 11/17/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/04/1993 Referred to
11/17/1993 Markup by
11/20/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-393
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights03/09/1993 Referred to
07/16/1993 Hearings by
11/16/1993 Markup by
11/16/1993 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1237.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1237. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/20/1993)

National Child Protection Act of 1993 - Establishes a national criminal history background check system (System) to which a designated agency in each State is required to report child abuse crime information, or index such information in the System, for purposes of background checks of child care providers.

(Sec. 2) Directs the Attorney General: (1) subject to availability of appropriations, to establish guidelines for the reporting or indexing of such information and timetables for each State to report; and (2) to publish annually a statistical summary of child abuse crimes and a summary of each State's progress in reporting to the System.

Requires: (1) State agencies to maintain close liaison for the exchange of technical assistance with the National Centers on Child Abuse and Neglect, for Missing and Exploited Children, and for the Prosecution of Child Abuse; and (2) the Administrator of the Office of Juvenile Justice and Delinquency Prevention to begin a study to determine various factors relating to child abuse crimes and offenders.

(Sec. 3) Authorizes a State to have in effect procedures that require qualified entities to contact a State agency to request a nationwide background check. Sets forth requirements of such procedures, including that: (1) no qualified entity may request a background check unless the provider first provides fingerprints and specified other information; (2) each provider subject to a background check is entitled to a copy of any background check report, to challenge its accuracy and completeness, and to obtain a prompt determination as to the validity of such challenge before a final determination is made by the authorized agency; (3) an authorized agency, upon receipt of such a report lacking disposition data, shall conduct research in whatever State and local recordkeeping systems are available in order to obtain complete data; and (4) such agency shall make a determination whether the provider has been convicted of, or is under pending indictment for, a crime that bears upon an individual's fitness to have responsibility for the safety and well-being of children and shall convey that determination to the qualified entity.

Sets forth provisions regarding liability and fees.

(Sec. 4) Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 (Omnibus Act) to provide for the use of drug control and system improvement grants for the improvement of State record systems and the sharing of records of child abuse crime information.

Directs the Attorney General, subject to appropriations and with preference to States with the lowest percent currency of case dispositions in computerized criminal history files, to make additional grants: (1) for the computerization of, and improvement of existing computerized, criminal history files; (2) to improve accessibility to the System; and (3) to assist the State in the transmittal of criminal records to, or the indexing of criminal history records in, the System.

Authorizes appropriations. Permits the withholding of up to ten percent of an allocation for a fiscal year under the Omnibus Act from a State that is not in compliance with the requirements of this Act.