Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 03/09/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 03/09/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/09/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/09/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/09/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/09/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/09/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/09/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/18/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/18/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/16/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 06/17/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/28/1993
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/29/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/30/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/01/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 07/13/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/13/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/14/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/13/1993