Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/10/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/24/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/24/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/24/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 04/29/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/29/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 04/29/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/29/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/29/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/29/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/29/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/29/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/29/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/29/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/29/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/29/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/29/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/29/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/29/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/29/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/29/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 04/29/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/29/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/29/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/29/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/29/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/29/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/29/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/29/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 04/29/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/27/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/27/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/27/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/27/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/27/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/27/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/27/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/13/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/13/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/13/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/13/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 07/13/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/13/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 07/13/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/13/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/13/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/13/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/13/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/13/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/13/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/04/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 08/04/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 08/04/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 08/04/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/04/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 08/04/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 08/04/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/14/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/14/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/14/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/14/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/14/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/14/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/14/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/14/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 10/14/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/14/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 10/14/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 10/14/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 02/24/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/24/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/24/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/24/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/24/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/24/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/24/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 02/24/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/14/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/14/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 04/14/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/14/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/14/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/14/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 04/14/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/17/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 05/26/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 05/26/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/26/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/04/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 08/04/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 08/04/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 08/04/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/04/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 08/04/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/03/1994