Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/10/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/10/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/11/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/11/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/30/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/30/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/30/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/30/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/30/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/21/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 04/21/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 05/20/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/25/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/09/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/09/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/09/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/09/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/09/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/09/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/09/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 09/21/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/27/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/04/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/13/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 11/10/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 11/10/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/10/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/15/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 06/29/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 07/14/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 07/19/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/01/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/07/1994