Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 03/11/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/11/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/20/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/20/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/20/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/20/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/20/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/20/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/20/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/20/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/20/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/20/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/20/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 04/20/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/20/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/20/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/20/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/20/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 04/20/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/20/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/20/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/20/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 05/05/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/05/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/05/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/05/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/27/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/27/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/27/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/27/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/27/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/27/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 08/06/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 08/06/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 08/06/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 08/06/1993
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 08/06/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 08/06/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 11/10/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/10/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 11/10/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/10/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/10/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 11/10/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 11/10/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/10/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/10/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/10/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/17/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/17/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/17/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/17/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/17/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/17/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/17/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/17/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/17/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/17/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/17/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 03/17/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/17/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/17/1994
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 03/17/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/17/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/13/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 04/13/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 04/13/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/13/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/13/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/13/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/12/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 05/12/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/12/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/12/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/12/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 05/12/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/14/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 07/14/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 07/14/1994
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/22/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 09/22/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/29/1994