Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/30/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/30/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/30/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/30/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/30/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/30/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/30/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/30/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 03/30/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/30/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/30/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 03/30/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/30/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/30/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/30/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/30/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 03/30/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/30/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 04/02/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/02/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/02/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/02/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/02/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/02/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/02/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/02/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/02/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 04/02/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/02/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/02/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/28/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/28/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/28/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 04/28/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 04/28/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/28/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/28/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/28/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/12/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/12/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/12/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/25/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/25/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/14/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/14/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/14/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/14/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/22/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/22/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/23/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/26/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 04/19/1994