Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/18/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/18/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/18/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/18/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/18/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/18/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/18/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/18/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/18/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 08/06/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/06/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/06/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/22/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 09/22/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/22/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/22/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/22/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/27/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/27/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/27/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/27/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/27/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/10/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/23/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/23/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/23/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/24/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/24/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/12/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/26/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/26/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 08/21/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/21/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/21/1994