Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 03/17/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/29/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 03/29/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/19/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/19/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 04/19/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 04/19/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/19/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/19/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 04/19/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/28/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 04/28/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/12/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/12/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/17/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/17/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/17/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/22/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/19/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/09/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 11/20/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/08/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/20/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 08/01/1994