Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/03/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/03/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/11/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/11/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/12/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/12/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/12/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/18/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/18/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/18/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/20/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 05/26/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/08/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/08/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/14/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/14/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/16/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/16/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/16/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/16/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/16/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/24/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/24/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/24/1993
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 06/30/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 07/01/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/13/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 07/13/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/13/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/13/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/13/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/15/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/21/1993