Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 03/18/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/18/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/29/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/29/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/29/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/17/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/17/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/17/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/04/1994