Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/24/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/20/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 04/21/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/29/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 04/29/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/29/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/29/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/29/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 05/05/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/19/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/19/1993
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/19/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/24/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/27/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/10/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/24/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/04/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/09/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 10/27/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 11/19/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 11/20/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/22/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 01/25/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 01/25/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 01/25/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/03/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/10/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 05/20/1994