Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 03/24/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/24/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/24/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/24/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/02/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/02/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/02/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/02/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/02/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/02/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/02/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/02/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/02/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/02/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/02/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/02/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/02/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/02/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/28/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/28/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/28/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/12/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/25/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/25/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/25/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/14/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/14/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/28/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/08/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 04/19/1994