Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/17/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/17/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/17/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/17/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/17/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 03/02/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/02/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/17/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/18/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/23/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/29/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/29/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/29/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/30/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/02/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/02/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 04/20/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/13/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/22/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 07/14/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/14/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/20/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/22/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/28/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 08/01/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 08/01/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 08/01/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew