Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/04/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/26/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/26/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/16/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/24/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 07/19/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/01/1994