Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/21/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/18/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/18/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/10/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 11/18/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/02/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/30/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 07/19/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 07/27/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 07/27/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 08/01/1994