Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/29/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/29/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/29/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/29/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/01/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/01/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/21/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/21/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/11/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/11/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/11/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/11/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/11/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/11/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/11/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/24/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/24/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/24/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 05/24/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/24/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/24/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/09/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/09/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/09/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 06/09/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/09/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/09/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/22/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/22/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/22/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 06/28/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 06/28/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/28/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/29/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/29/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/22/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 07/22/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/22/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/22/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/22/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/22/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/22/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/22/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/22/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/22/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 07/22/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 08/06/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 08/06/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 08/06/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 09/29/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/29/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 09/29/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/29/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/29/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/29/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/19/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 11/19/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 11/19/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 11/19/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 11/19/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/03/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/03/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/10/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/10/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/23/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/23/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/23/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/05/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 05/05/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/05/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 06/29/1994
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/29/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 08/09/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew