Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/21/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/28/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/04/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/06/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/10/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/10/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/20/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/14/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/02/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/08/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/07/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/10/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 11/10/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/10/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/22/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/23/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/23/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/23/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 02/01/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/01/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/02/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 03/02/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 03/23/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/19/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/11/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/19/1994