Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 03/30/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/30/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/30/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/30/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/21/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/21/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/21/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/21/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/25/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/25/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/25/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/25/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/25/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 05/25/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/25/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/06/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/06/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/03/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/23/1994