Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/25/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/25/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/25/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/22/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/22/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 04/22/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/22/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/25/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/25/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/01/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/01/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/20/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/20/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/05/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/05/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/28/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 09/28/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 09/28/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 02/08/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/08/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/08/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 03/11/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 04/14/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/14/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/14/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 05/18/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/26/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/26/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/26/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 06/09/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/09/1994
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/21/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/24/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/29/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/29/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/12/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 07/12/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/19/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/19/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/22/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/22/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/22/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/29/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/29/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/29/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 08/16/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 08/16/1994
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 08/16/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/16/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 08/16/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 08/16/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/16/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/16/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/16/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 08/16/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 08/18/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/18/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/18/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/18/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/18/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 09/13/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/13/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/13/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/13/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/13/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/13/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/13/1994
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 09/22/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/22/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/22/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/22/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 09/28/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/28/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/05/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 10/05/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 10/07/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 10/07/1994