There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the United States courthouse located at 10th and Main Streets in Richmond, Virginia, as the "Lewis F. Powell, Jr. United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/06/1993Became Public Law No: 103-95.
10/06/1993Signed by President.
09/24/1993Presented to President.
09/20/1993Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/20/1993Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12052)
05/04/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
04/29/1993Reported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 103-74.
03/29/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
10/06/1993Became Public Law No: 103-95.
10/06/1993Signed by President.
09/24/1993HousePresented to President.
09/21/1993SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/20/1993SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/20/1993SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12052)
05/05/1993SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
05/04/1993-2:48pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/04/1993-2:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
05/04/1993-2:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
05/04/1993-2:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2228-2230)
05/04/1993-2:36pmHouseMr. Traficant moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/29/1993HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 37.
04/29/1993HouseReported by the Committee on Public Works + Transportation. H. Rept. 103-74.
04/28/1993HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
04/28/1993HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/27/1993HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
04/27/1993HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
04/27/1993HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
04/12/1993HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
03/29/1993HouseReferred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
03/29/1993HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation03/29/1993 Referred to
04/28/1993 Markup by
04/29/1993 Reported by H.Rept 103-74
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds04/12/1993 Referred to
04/27/1993 Hearings by
04/27/1993 Markup by
04/27/1993 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works05/05/1993 Referred to
09/20/1993 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1513. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/29/1993)

Designates the United States courthouse located at 10th and Main Streets, Richmond, Virginia, as the Lewis F. Powell, Jr. United States Courthouse.